Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Community College Vocational Certificate, Apprenticeship Training Program, and Associate's Degree Tuition Assistance Program; specifying that participation in the Program is voluntary; requiring an individual, to participate in the Program, to enroll at a community college within 6 months of obtaining a high school diploma or a certain equivalent; requiring participants to complete at least 15 hours of community service; providing certain reimbursement to community colleges for foregone tuition; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0976
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0678 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Community Colleges – Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate Degrees – Tuition Assistance
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM