Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Eckardt, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who, except in self-defense, intentionally inflicts bodily harm, permanent disability, or death on a service animal is guilty of the felony of aggravated cruelty to animals; prohibiting a person from making a false statement that an animal is a service animal for specified purposes; providing penalties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-606 )
(   7-701, 7-705.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM