Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to notify a person who is convicted of a specified litter disposal offense that the person's driver's license may be suspended; requiring a court to notify the Motor Vehicle Administration of a specified violation involving litter disposal; requiring the Chief Judge of the District Court and the Administrative Office of the Courts, in conjunction with the Administration, to establish specified procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-110 )
(   16-206.2, 26-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM