Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference Expenses
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Cassilly, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Jennings, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Mathias, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, Reilly, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including as an allowable expenditure of funds from a campaign account under the State election law a disbursement to pay for travel, lodging, meals, and registration expenses associated with attendance of an office holder or a candidate at meetings or conferences focused on legislative issues, process, or public policy analysis pertinent to the office the elected official holds or that the candidate seeks.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0239
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0119 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464331/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464331/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464331/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted (30-14)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {833620/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/13 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464331/1 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464331/1 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464331/1 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Committee Amendment (#2) Adopted (30-14) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {833620/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until 4/13 (Senator Conway) Adopted 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM