Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Brochin, Guzzone, Jennings, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a specified disposition hearing; requiring the juvenile court to direct the provision of specified services to a specified child during a permanency planning hearing or guardianship hearing; providing that, if the juvenile court enters an order directing the provision of services to a specified child under specified provisions of law, the juvenile court retains jurisdiction for as long as the order is effective and for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0279
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0448 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {588277/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-7)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {588277/1 Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Text - Third - Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Judiciary 28
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (130-7) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 655
Text - Chapter - Guardianship and Child in Need of Assistance Proceedings - Jurisdiction and Authority of Juvenile Court
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-801, 3-804, 3-819, 3-823 )
(   5-301, 5-324, 5-328 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM