Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Astle, Kelley, Klausmeier, Middleton, and Mathias
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of freight from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures regarding the specified crew requirements; establishing penalties of $500 for the first offense and $1,000 for a second offense and each subsequent offense committed within a period of 3 years of the second offense; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507371/1
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507371/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507371/1
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (32-14)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {653325/2 Rejected (17-28)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2016 2/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {507371/1 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 32
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {507371/1 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {507371/1 36
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 36
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 36
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 39
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (32-14) 40
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Hough) Adopted 40
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {653325/2 Rejected (17-28) 41
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 43
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 51
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM