Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a specified affidavit or any two specified proofs may be provided as evidence of a domestic partnership to qualify for an exemption from the inheritance tax on the receipt of interest in real property held in joint tenancy that passes from a decedent to a domestic partner.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1104
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759532/1
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments {759532/1 20
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 20
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {759532/1 Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Text - Third - Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 24
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Ways and Means 26
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM