Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Health and Safety - Food Transparency
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Failed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified local school systems to create specified dining menus; requiring a specified dining menu to include specified information under specified circumstances; requiring specified local school systems to post specified information on the local school system's Web site; requiring specified public schools to provide a specified link on the public school's Web site under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1208
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204136/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204136/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204136/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-24)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Failed
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {204136/1 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {204136/1 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {204136/1 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (21-24) 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Failed 47
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM