Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Beidle, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Gallion, Hershey, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $100,000 of income each year for individuals who are receiving certain benefits under the Social Security Act, or who are at least 65 years old and are not employed full-time; establishing certain limits on the subtraction modification for certain taxable years; prohibiting income included in certain subtraction modifications from being included under the subtraction modification; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0342
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2020
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 2:12 PM