Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Kelley, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a prospective bidder or offeror when submitting a bid or offer for a public work contract to submit to the public body a specified contractor safety and health plan and a specified attestation; requiring a contract safety and health plan to include specified information; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to develop a specified safety and health calculation worksheet and specified safety and health rating system; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Reassigned to Finance 17
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-801 through 17-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM