Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landscape Architects - License Renewal - Continuing Professional Competency Requirement
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Examiners of Landscape Architects to adopt regulations to require a licensee to demonstrate continuing professional competency as a condition of renewal of a license to practice landscape architecture by completing a specified number of hours of professional development activities; and providing for the implementation of the professional competency requirement on a phased-in basis.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 26
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 28
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 31
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (103-35) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM