Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Gladden, Guzzone, Hershey, Madaleno, Manno, Raskin, Ready, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from possessing, with the intent to unlawfully use, an implement of dogfighting; establishing penalties on conviction of a violation of the Act of a maximum imprisonment of 90 days or a maximum fine of $5,000 or both; providing that each implement of dogfighting possessed in violation of the Act is a separate offense; and authorizing a court to order a specified defendant to participate in and pay for psychological counseling as a condition of sentencing.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0583
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {928076/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {928076/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Judiciary 43
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-607.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM