Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Augustine, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hester, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State an expanded polystyrene food service product on or after July 1, 2020; prohibiting food service businesses and schools from selling or providing food or beverages in expanded polystyrene food service products on or after July 1, 2020; confirming the authority of certain local government entities to establish standards that are at least as stringent as those in the Act; requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a public education and outreach antilittering campaign; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0109
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0651 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2019
Legislative Date
1/28/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614637/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
35A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {903723/1 (Senator Kagan)
Proceedings
35A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
35A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {563229/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {903723/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {153329/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {253522/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {493526/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {843126/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/05 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {980511/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2019 1/28/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {614637/1 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 34
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 35A
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Floor Amendment {903723/1 (Senator Kagan) 35A
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted 35A
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {563229/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31) 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {903723/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {153329/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (15-32) 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {253522/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {493526/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29) 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {843126/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Prohibition
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/05 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 39
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters 41
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {980511/1 Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Text - Chapter - Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2201 through 9-2207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM