Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "school vehicle"; and establishing that a "school vehicle" includes specified vehicles used to transport children, students, and teachers in another state, subject to specified conditions.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0284
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-154, 11-173, 11-174 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM