Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage Law
Sponsored by
Senators Stone and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study the Applicability of the Maryland Prevailing Wage Law; providing for the membership and cochairs of the Task Force; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, with assistance from the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, to staff the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to examine the current Prevailing Wage Law and how it applies to school construction projects; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1098
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0368 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647275/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable with Amendments {647275/1 Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM