Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Hough, and Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "cottage food product" to include nonhazardous food, as specified in certain Department of Health regulations, that is sold in the State in accordance with certain provisions of law and regulations directly to a consumer or to retail food stores or food cooperatives; requiring cottage food products for sale at a retail food store to include a certain label with certain information; requiring a business owner to submit certain information to the Department before selling a cottage food product; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0527
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Cottage Food Products - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Cottage Food Products - Definition
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {677376/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Text - Third - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text - Chapter - Public Health – Cottage Food Products – Definition and Sale
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-301, 21-330.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM