Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Land Records - Fraudulent Recordings
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Kelley, Madaleno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from causing a specified instrument to be recorded in the land records of a county under specified circumstances; requiring a clerk of the circuit court to send a specified notice to the parties named in a deed or other instrument affecting real property no later than 30 days after recording the deed or other instrument; specifying the minimum contents of the notice; requiring the notice to be sent by certified mail, return receipt requested; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-112, 3-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM