Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the Elevator Safety Review Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2019, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board be performed on or before December 15, 2016; and repealing the termination provisions that apply to the regulation of mediation or arbitration of labor disputes, choice of bargaining representative, and strikebreakers.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0257
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 30, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 18
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 20
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 23
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-842 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM