Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program in the State Department of Education; requiring the Department, after consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to implement the Program for 125 students in public high school in Prince George's County and 125 students in public high school in one other county; authorizing the State Department of Education to collaborate with specified local community organizations; specifying the purpose of the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0198
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1069 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-415.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM