Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the percentage of the federal earned income credit used for determining the amount that specified individuals may claim as a refund under the Maryland earned income credit under specified circumstances; altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow specified individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1047
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/03/2016 Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Expansion
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM