Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program in Prince George's County; requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education, after consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to implement the Program for 125 students in public high schools in Prince George's County; authorizing the Board of Education to collaborate with specified local community organizations; specifying the purpose of the Program; requiring the Board of Education to report annually; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0197
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684632/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684632/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {684632/1 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 44
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {684632/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 49
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 60
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-415.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM