Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Habilitative Services - Period of Time for Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Kelley, Klausmeier, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending until at least the end of the month in which the insured or enrollee turns 19 years old the period of time during which health insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations are required to provide coverage of habilitative services for its insureds and enrollees who are children; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597879/1
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {137071/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {597879/1 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton) 27
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {137071/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 71
House 4/11/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 72
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-835 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM