Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirement that a Class BC beer, wine, and liquor license holder provide food for consumption at certain catered events in Carroll County so that either the license holder or the event sponosor shall provide food for the catered event.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0572
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-102, 16-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM