Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) Licenses
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, as a prerequisite to obtaining a license, the proportion of food and alcoholic beverages sales to which an applicant for a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license is required to attest be at least equal to 40% of gross receipts; requiring, as a prerequisite to renewing the license, the proportion of food and alcoholic beverages sales to which an applicant for a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license is required to attest be at least equal to 40% of the gross receipts from sales during a 12-month time period; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0142
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {664330/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {664330/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM