Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Achieving Computer Science Collaborations for Employing Students Statewide (ACCESS) Act of 2018
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Mathias, Ready, Reilly, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop and adopt content standards for computer science education in kindergarten through grade 12 by November 30, 2018; requiring the State Board to consult with certain persons in developing certain standards; requiring the State Department of Education to develop a certain implementation plan; requiring high schools, middle schools, and elementary schools to offer certain computer science courses, education, or curricula beginning in the certain school years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0350
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2018
Legislative Date
1/22/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2018 1/22/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Achieving Computer Science Collaborations for Employing Students Statewide (ACCESS) Act of 2018
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-118, 7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM