Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Child Care Providers - High School Diploma or GED Test
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, and Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the regulations of the State Department of Education to provide for a requirement that a registered family child care provider has obtained a high school diploma or a passing score on the GED test; applying the Act prospectively, etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
8A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2016 1/22/2016 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 8A
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   5-551 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page