Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "agricultural land transfer tax" and defining "total rate of tax" to provide that, for purposes of specified provisions of law concerning the calculation of the agricultural land transfer tax, the tax does not include a specified surcharge; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0833
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-20)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 32
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (119-20) 70
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301, 13-302, 13-303, 13-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM