Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering specified fees for specified holders of alcoholic beverages licenses in Baltimore City; requiring specified holders of specified licenses in Baltimore City to pay a specified fee each year if they provide live entertainment or outdoor table or cafe service; requiring a specified license application to contain a specified statement concerning the citizenship of the applicant or specified information or documentation to show proof of alien status; requiring part-time inspectors to serve for a 2-year term; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 10-204, 15-112, 16-410, 16-507, 5-101, 5-201, 5-301, 5-401, 6-101, 6-102, 6-201, 6-301, 6-401, 7-101, 8-203, 8-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM