Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $9,410,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Calvert County and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904164/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Appropriations 28
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {904164/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 66A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendment 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM