Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Elfreth, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the privileges of a racetrack license in Anne Arundel County; specifying certain attributes of a licensed racing establishment; specifying the location where beer, wine, and liquor may be sold under the license; specifying that the playing of music and dancing may occur on the licensed premises; allowing the carrying and consuming of beer, wine, and liquor anywhere on the licensed premises; authorizing the issuance of a racetrack concessionaire license; establishing an annual license fee of $5,000; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0374
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Racetrack License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Racetrack License
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {184436/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Economic Matters 43A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1007, 11-1007.1, 11-102, 11-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM