Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Cassilly, Hough, Lee, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an agency that is participating in a child abuse or neglect investigation and that has substantial grounds to believe that a person has knowingly failed to report child abuse as required under a specified provision of law to file a specified complaint with a specified board, agency, institution, or facility.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0245
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-9)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/03/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 37
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary 42
House 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (129-9) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-705.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM