Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children - Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Advertising and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senators King, Bates, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, Madaleno, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring advertisements for specified child care services to include specified information; authorizing specified employees of the State Department of Education or the State Fire Marshal, a deputy State fire marshal, a special assistant State fire marshal, or a local fire marshal to visit, and authorizing the employees of the Department to serve a civil citation to specified child care homes and child care centers if the child care home or child care center is advertised and is not registered or licensed with the Department; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0329
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {864730/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216281/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-18)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {864730/1 Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {216281/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-18) 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Passed Enrolled 58
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-501, 5-550, 5-551, 5-552, 5-557, 5-557.1, 5-570, 5-574, 5-582, 5-583, 5-583.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM