Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Manno, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Raskin, Ready, Salling, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Regulating how public senior higher education institutions may adjust funds awarded by the institution when students receive additional financial aid from federal, State, or private sources; authorizing financial aid awarded by a public senior higher education institution to be reduced in a specified order under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0231
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {854830/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2016 1/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {854830/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations 52
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM