Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native Language
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Guzzone, Madaleno, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the parents of a child with a disability to request the translation into their native language of a completed individualized education program or a completed individualized family service plan; and requiring specified school personnel to provide the parents with a translation of a completed individualized education program or a completed individualized family service plan within 30 days after the date of the request.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0044
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM