Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Brochin, Cassilly, and Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a court may issue a final protective order for a period not to exceed 2 years by consent of the respondent under specified circumstances; and authorizing a judge, under specified circumstances, to extend the term of a protective order for a specified period of time if the respondent named in the protective order consents to the extension.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618874/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {618874/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary 43A
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506, 4-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM