Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - Standards
Sponsored by
Senator Getty
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "serious crime" to provide that a register of wills or court may not grant letters of administration to a person convicted of a crime that reflects adversely on an individual's honesty, trustworthiness, or fitness to perform the duties of a personal representative; providing an exception; prohibiting a court, unless good cause is shown, from appointing, as a guardian of the person of a minor or disabled person, a person who has been convicted of a specified crime; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0656
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0649 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 First Reading Judiciary 38
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-114, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM