Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain per diem licenses in Washington County; altering the requirements for a Class C per diem beer, wine, and liquor license so that the license may be issued to a certain corporation, society, organization, association, or other entity that does not have a certain annual on-sale license; altering the privileges of the license to authorize the holder to sell or serve beer, wine, or liquor for on-premises consumption during an event that requires an admission fee, a ticket, or a donation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1320
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 31-102, 31-1301, 31-1312, 31-1313, 31-1314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM