Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsored by
Senator Bates
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that if the owner of specified land or the owner's agent contracts for the provision of specified services, the land and any improvements are subject to the establishment of a mechanics' lien for the payment of all debts, without regard to the amount, contracted for work done and materials furnished for or about a building, whether or not a building on the land is erected, repaired, rebuilt, or improved; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0442
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM