Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Simonaire, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to satisfy a requirement to publish legal notices in a newspaper of general circulation by posting the notices on the county's or municipality's website; requiring notices posted on a county or municipality website to be conspicuously displayed and to be easily accessible; requiring a county or municipality that chooses to post notices on the Internet to publish a certain notice in a newspaper of general circulation in the county or municipality and to offer a certain mail service; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0553
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0523 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM