Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsored by
Senators Forehand, Benson, Currie, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Madaleno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the age requirements for specified provisions of law relating to tobacco products; prohibiting a person from selling or dispensing tobacco products through a vending machine unless the machine is located in an establishment that an individual under the age of 21 years is prohibited by law from entering; prohibiting the distribution of a tobacco product or tobacco paraphernalia to an individual under the age of 21 years except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-107, 10-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM