Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to require elected officials of a local government, under specified circumstances, to reimburse the local government for specified costs related to a legal defense provided by the local government; providing that, under specified circumstances, specified elected officials of a local government are fully liable for damages awarded in or for the amount of a settlement resulting from specified actions; providing that the State is not liable to specified State elected officials for specified payments; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-302, 5-303, 5-522 )
(   12-305, 12-310, 12-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM