Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan Elections
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a method of electing judges of the orphans' courts on a nonpartisan basis, without regard to political party affiliation; establishing a primary election for candidates for nomination for a specified office to be administered in a specified manner; authorizing any registered voter, with or without any political party affiliation, to participate in such a primary; prohibiting candidates from appearing on primary ballots under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0515
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424731/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424731/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)
Proceedings
43
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {424731/1 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {424731/1 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson) 43
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 5-301, 5-703, 5-703.1, 8-901 through 8-905, 9-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM