Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that changes in provisions of law relating to the application of diminution credits made by the Justice Reinvestment Act shall be construed prospectively to apply to inmates who are sentenced or committed to custody on a finding of violation of probation on or after October 1, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0274
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {352513/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed 39
Text - Third - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Judiciary 43
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {352513/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 57
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Text - Chapter - Justice Reinvestment Act - Diminution Credits - Sentencing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM