Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Civil Actions - Subpoena for Police Officer - Liability of Party for Reimbursement of Cost
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (By Request - Baltimore County Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a party who requests the issuance of a subpoena in a civil action to compel the attendance of a police officer employed by the Baltimore County Police Department to reimburse the Police Department for the cost of the police officer's salary and travel expenses to attend court; requiring a deposit of $250 to be tendered when the subpoena is served; providing that a police officer is not required to attend court in response to a subpoena unless the required deposit has been paid; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM