Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy Sheriff
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition of "public safety employee" to include a deputy sheriff in Baltimore County for purposes of providing enhanced compensation benefits under the Workers' Compensation Law for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than a specified number of weeks under specified circumstances; and providing the Act be applied prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0012
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {997472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-19)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {997472/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 52
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (119-19) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-628, 9-629 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM