Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District Court
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Judiciary)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Baltimore, Charles, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties and Baltimore City; and increasing the number of resident judges of the District Court in District 5 (Prince George's County) and District 6 (Montgomery County).
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0111
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM