Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Currie, Ferguson, Kelley, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Pugh, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the types of beverages that a restaurant may include in the price of a children's menu of meal options or a meal that is represented as a child's meal; and authorizing a restaurant to offer specified beverages to minors for a charge.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0742 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-304.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM