Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification
Sponsored by
Senators Jones-Rodwell, Benson, Brinkley, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Garagiola, Jacobs, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, Zirkin, Astle, Glassman, Pipkin, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, subject to a provision of law, a center where mammography testing is performed to include in a screening results letter that is sent to a patient as required by federal law, notice about breast density; authorizing the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, under specified circumstances, to adopt regulations to change the content of a specified notice; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647274/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {796082/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {647274/1 Report Adopted 25
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 30
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {796082/1 Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 61A
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM