Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Lee, Conway, Pinsky, Bates, Kagan, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Salling, Waugh, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting victims of human trafficking from paying a specified out-of-county fee or out-of-region fee at community colleges in the State; authorizing each board of community college trustees to waive a specified out-of-county fee or out-of-region fee for students who are not residents of the county and are victims of human trafficking; requiring a community college to collect specified information and report to the Commission each year; requiring the Commission to submit a specified annual report to the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0847
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {744030/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {605760/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {744030/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {605760/1 Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 57
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM