Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Brochin, Colburn, DeGrange, Getty, Kittleman, Manno, Muse, Raskin, Shank, Stone, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the interest rate paid on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy under a residential lease or by a mobile home park owner and when an evicted or ejected tenant makes a timely written demand for return of the security deposit from 3% per annum to the daily U.S. Treasury yield curve rate for 1 year, as of the first business day of each year, or 1.5%, whichever is greater; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to maintain on its Web site a specified list or calculator; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0045
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0361 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/24/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-203, 8A-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM